Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79992
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/12/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Check no. 1023. (SC)
11/12/2019Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "Action Necessary by 11/20/19 Return Minor to Nevada to Maintain His School and Resident Status Quo. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 11/15/19)19-46279
11/14/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seal Appendix Attached to Original Petition Filed on 11/12/19 and Motion for Transmittal of "Illegal Child Interview" that Involves Minor Child. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 11/15/19)19-46808
11/15/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-46963
11/15/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
11/20/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued letter to Ali Shahrokhi re: check returned for insufficient funds and requesting payment of filing fee within 10 days. (SC)19-47425
11/20/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [Appellant's November 15, 2019, motion to file the appendix under seal and to order transmittal of the child interview is granted in part. The district court record was sealed below; therefore, the clerk of this court shall detach and file the portions of the appendix provisionally received on November 15, 2019, that constitute district court records, specifically pages 1-21, 22-34, and 62-66, under seal. SRCR 7. The rest of the appendix shall be filed, but not under seal. In the future, appellant should separately submit any individual portions of an appendix that he requests be filed under seal. As the child interview is not necessary for our review of this writ petition, we deny appellant's motion to order its transmittal.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC).
12/02/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Check no. 1121. (SC)
12/16/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
12/16/2019RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)19-50800
12/16/2019Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)