Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80018
Short Caption:CLARK (WALTER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66671, 76529
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C280364Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/15/2021 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/15/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-46865
11/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (NOA filed by Appellant Counsel) (SC)19-46872
11/21/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-47787
11/25/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/5/12, 4/10/12, 4/19/12, 5/8/12, 5/29/12, 6/5/12, 6/7/12, 7/10/12, 7/17/12, 7/26/12, 8/21/12, 10/30/12, 12/13/12, 12/18/12, 12/20/12, 6/11/13, 8/20/13, 9/10/13, 10/22/13, 10/28/13, 11/5/13, 3/11/214, and 3/17/14. To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols and Sara Richardson.19-48114
11/25/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/20/14(2). To Court Reporter: Sara Richardson. (SC)19-48212
03/13/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 30, 2020. (SC).20-10020
03/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).20-12137
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file an serve an amended transcript request form that fully complies with NRAP 9(a)(3)(C). Appellant shall have until May 29, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-14345
04/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/20/14 To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. (SC)20-15268
05/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-20429
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)20-20443
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)20-20444
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)20-20445
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)20-20446
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)20-20447
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)20-20448
05/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC)20-20449
06/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-22456
06/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a third extension of time, until June 12, 2020, to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. The opening brief was filed on June 16, 2020. Respondent shall have until July 16, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. fn1[Appellant also asks for an extension of time to file the appendix. However, the appendix was timely filed on May 29, 2020. ] (SC)20-22761
07/16/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-26103
07/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until September 14, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-27932
09/14/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file an Answering Brief. (SC).20-33676
09/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until October 14, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-34229
10/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37734
10/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-37744
10/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-37745
11/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC).20-42101
11/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-42378
12/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-44896
12/10/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 15, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06431
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-09278
04/15/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 80018. (SNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
06/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18876
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21572
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21572