Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80040
Short Caption:BALINSKI VS. OCWEN FIN. CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A729068Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/26/2019 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/19/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-47296
11/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-47299
11/22/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Brandon L. Phillips
11/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-48289
11/26/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC).19-48333
12/10/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 20, 2019, at 2:00 pm. (SC).19-49945
12/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.19-51741
01/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File Docketing Statement. Due: 10 days. (SC)20-02307
02/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 3, 2020, at 4:00 PM. (SC)20-05374
02/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 11, 2020, at 4:00 PM. (SC)20-05376
02/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC).20-05903
02/13/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 18, 2020, at 4:00 PM. (SC)20-06157
03/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Imposing Conditional Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 14 days or Docketing Statement or Motion due: 7 days. (SC)20-10254
03/24/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement (REJECTED PER 03/25/20 NOTICE). (SC).
03/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Docketing Statement). (SC).20-11439
03/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) (DETACHED DOCKETING STATEMENT AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 04/24/20 ORDER).20-11585
04/09/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 3, 2020 at 3:30 PM. (SC)20-13587
04/09/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 12, 2020, at 1:30 PM. (SC)20-13589
04/23/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 1, 2020, at 2:00 PM. (SC)20-15579
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 16, 2020, this court entered an order imposing conditional sanctions on appellant for failure to file the docketing statement. On March 24, 2020, appellant filed an untimely docketing statement, which this court rejected on March 25, 2020. On March 26, 2020, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement, attributing its untimeliness to having inadvertently miscalendered the due date. The docketing statement is attached to the motion. We grant the motion, and vacate the conditional sanctions imposed on March 16, 2020. The clerk of this court is directed to detach the docketing statement from appellant's motion and to file it as a separate document. (SC).20-15700
04/24/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-15701
05/06/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-17156
05/11/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-17772
08/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-30513
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Due: 7 Days. (SC)20-31358
09/01/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-32327
09/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Answering Brief due: October 15, 2020. (SC)20-35030
10/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37736
10/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-37738
10/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-37739
12/01/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11112
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13412
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13412