Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80051
Short Caption:DAVIS (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR190083Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-47465
12/13/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. (SC)19-50566
12/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law. (SC)19-51117
12/18/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 17, 2019. This matter is referred to Appointed Counsel Administrator, Krista M. Meier, Esq. (SC)19-51117
01/13/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on January 12, 2020 appointing Karla K. Butko as counsel for appellant.20-01457
01/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC).20-02774
01/27/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Transcripts at Taxpayers' Expense. (SC)20-03650
02/04/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-04856
04/01/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Carol Hummel stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/16/19. (SC)20-12420
04/01/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/14/19. (SC)20-12507
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley A. Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/15/19. (SC)20-16997
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/12/19. (SC)20-17001
05/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Continuance/Extension of Time in Which to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-17301
05/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 20, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-18235
05/13/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/15/19.20-18272
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-26158
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 continued. (SC)20-26159
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-26160
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-26162
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-26163
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-26165
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-26167
07/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement (Criminal). (SC)20-26176
07/17/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26267
08/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief Due: August 31, 2020. (SC)20-30273
08/31/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-32075
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-32077
09/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-35071
09/23/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16896
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19185
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 8, 2021. (SC)21-19185