Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80053
Short Caption:ORELLANA (CARLOS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):56438, 73118
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C252397Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-47480
11/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED District Court Minutes. (SC)
12/03/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/08/17. (SC).19-49015
12/11/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-50232
12/12/2019MotionFiled Court Recorder Robin Page's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript. (SC)19-50537
12/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Robin Page's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: February 4, 2020. (SC).19-51085
12/24/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/22/14, 03/24/14, 05/20/15, 06/17/15, 06/19/15, 06/24/15, 10/12/15, 07/13/16, 05/16/17, 05/24/17 and 06/05/17. (SC)19-52016
02/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/22/17, 09/12/17, 11/16/17, 01/09/18, 02/20/18, 04/03/18, 04/19/18, 05/10/18, 08/23/18, 12/04/18, 01/31/19, 02/14/19, 05/16/19, 07/11/19, 07/15/19, 07/16/19, 07/17/19, 07/19/19, 07/22/19, 07/23/19, 07/24/19/ 07/25/19, 07/26/19, 07/29/19, 07/30/19, 09/24/19 and 10/10/19. (SC)20-04998
03/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (1st Request). (SC).20-10795
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 19, 2020. (SC).20-11641
05/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (2nd Request). (SC)20-19024
05/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 6, 2020. (SC).20-20131
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (3rd Request). (SC).20-24809
07/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 5, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-25219
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1 of 13. (SC)20-28118
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2 of 13. (SC)20-28119
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 3 of 13. (SC)20-28121
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 4 of 13. (SC)20-28132
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 5 of 13. (SC)20-28134
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 6 of 13. (SC)20-28135
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 7 of 13. (SC)20-28137
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 8 of 13. (SC)20-28138
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 9 of 13. (SC)20-28141
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 10 of 13. (SC)20-28142
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 11 of 13. (SC)20-28145
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 12 of 13. (SC)20-28146
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 13 of 13. (SC)20-28147
08/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-28241
09/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Johnathan E. VanBoskerck, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-32328
09/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-32329
09/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until November 2, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-33606
10/29/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-39700
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-39702
11/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-43299
12/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-43875
12/04/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-08669
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH21-15274
06/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-16989
06/14/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
06/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18518
07/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-19967
07/26/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC)21-21519
08/25/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-24751
08/25/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 26, 2021. (SC)21-24751