Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80057
Short Caption:HESSER VS. GEWERTERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81412
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A744994Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/05/2019 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-47547
11/20/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-47549
11/20/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-47546
11/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC)
12/02/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Byron E. Thomas
12/03/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Case Appeal Statement due: December 16, 2019. (SC)19-48863
12/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-48924
12/05/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC).19-49425
12/16/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-50916
12/26/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 1/30/20 at 10:00 a.m. at Bryan Thomas. (SC)19-52191
01/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC).20-00872
01/17/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-02600
01/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. (SC)20-02695
02/20/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-07028
02/25/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-07569
03/10/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: March 24, 2020. (SC)20-09390
03/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution in Proper Person of Respondents. (SC)20-09700
03/24/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/24/17, 12/05/17, 09/30/19, 10/01/19, 10/02/19, 10/03/19 and 10/04/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkings, Renee R. Silvagio and Z Howard. (SC)20-11373
05/22/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend the Time for Appellant to File Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2). (SC).20-19684
05/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 25, 2020. (SC).20-19769
06/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-23889
06/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 13, 2020. (SC)20-24154
07/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC)
07/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC)20-25804
07/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC)20-26980
07/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth Request). (SC)20-27883
08/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Sixth Request). (SC)20-28927
08/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 7 days. (SC)20-29869
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC).20-30749
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II-V. (SC).20-30751
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI-IX. (SC).20-30755
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume X-XI. (SC).20-30756
08/20/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 08/21/20 NOTICE). (SC).
08/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC).20-30867
08/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-31550
09/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: October 9, 2020. (SC)20-35322
10/08/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extending Time to File Respondent's/Cross/Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH SONJA OF HAROLD P. GEWERTER, ESQ., LTD., THIS IS NOT A CROSS-APPEAL). (SC)
10/08/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extending Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-37013
10/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: October 23, 2020. (SC)20-37317
10/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-39012
11/20/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 7, 2020. (SC)20-42468
12/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-44478
12/08/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11075
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13413
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13413