Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0551
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SCR 210(2)Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:11/25/2019Public Hearing:01/23/2020 at 2:00 PM (Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/2019Administrative CaseFiled Nevada Supreme Court Access to Justice Commission's Petition to Amend SCR 210(2) to Provide Continuing Legal Education Credit for Pro Bono Legal Service.Y19-48198
12/05/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Public Hearing Scheduled for January 23, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Comment Deadline: January 15, 2020, at 5:00 p.m.19-49343
12/31/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Francis C. Flaherty, Chair of the State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education. (via-e-mail)19-52472
01/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Francis C. Flaherty, Chair of the State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education. (via-original).20-00120
01/10/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Francis C. Flaherty, Chair of the State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education. (Amended exhibit A attached).20-01376
01/23/2020Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
01/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Inviting Additional Comment. Comments may be submitted to the court electronically on in hard-copy format. All comments must be submitted by 5:00 p.m., January 31, 2020.20-03459
01/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Frances M. Doherty, Senior District Judge. (via email)20-04431
01/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Brad Lewis, Director Nevada Supreme Court Access to Justice Commission. (via email)20-04434
01/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from AnnaMarie Johnson, Executive Director, Nevada Legal Services. (via email)20-04436
02/13/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 210.20-06073