Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80097
Short Caption:GUNDALA VS. BAC HOME LOANS SERV., LPCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71881
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A695905Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/26/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/26/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-48304
11/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-48306
12/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong. Check no. 3450. (SC)
12/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-49568
12/10/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-49996
12/11/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: January 7, 2020; Docketing Statement due: January 10, 2020. (SC).19-50118
01/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)20-00892
01/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-01190
03/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 22, 2020. (SC).20-11399
04/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC).20-15312
04/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until May 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-16241
05/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC).20-19527
06/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.20-21079
06/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Third Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC).20-23167
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-24128
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 6, 2020. (SC).20-26129
08/05/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-28920
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)20-28921
09/02/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-32354
09/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 5, 2020. (SC)20-32375
09/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Time Extension for Answering Brief. (SC)20-35591
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 19, 2020. (SC).20-35979
10/16/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-38193
10/16/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-38195
11/13/2020MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Reply Brief. (SC).20-41625
11/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: December 16, 2020. (SC).20-41642
11/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Holly E. Walker of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-42436
01/14/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
01/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Donna M. Wittig, Esq. of the law firm of Akerman LLP, as counsel for respondent, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servings LP). (SC)21-02890
02/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Holly E. Walker is no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP and requests that Ms. Walker be removed from the service list). (SC)21-03166
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED."NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11081
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13419
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13419