Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80112
Short Caption:PREMIER ONE HOLDINGS, INC. VS. RED ROCK FIN. SERVS., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73360
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A750447Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/03/2019 / Chapin, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Morris Law Center. Check no. 4071. (SC)
12/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-48668
12/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-48670
12/03/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC)19-48979
12/23/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-51783
01/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 7, 2020, at 9:30 am. (SC).20-00825
03/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 12, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC)20-11707
05/06/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 23, 2020. (SC)20-17098
05/20/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by August 3, 2020. (SC).20-19186
07/23/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-26917
07/27/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-27154
08/06/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested:9/18/19. To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. (SC)20-28994
10/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-38395
10/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date: November 25, 2020. (SC)20-38454
11/25/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-43120
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-43123
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-43126
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 (SC)20-43127
12/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ON 12/16/20) (SC)
12/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC)20-45601
12/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/16/20)
12/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC)20-45629
12/17/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-45659
12/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date January 27, 2021. (SC)20-45663
12/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Steven B. Scow. (SC)20-45670
01/27/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02522
01/28/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (SC)21-02652
02/24/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: March 12, 2021. (SC)21-05496
03/12/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07267
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13949
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16307
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16307