Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80116
Short Caption:CHICAGO TITLE OF NEV., INC. VS. CHTD. HOLDINGS, INC. C/W 79180Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:79180*, 80116Related Case(s):79180
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A749645Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/03/2019 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-48735
12/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)19-48736
12/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-48738
12/02/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Natalie C. Lehman
12/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-48906
12/03/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC).19-49021
12/09/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).19-49875
12/12/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).19-50323
12/23/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (80116). Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).19-51708
12/23/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (80116). Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).19-51709
12/23/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/06/19, 05/07/19, 05/08/19, 05/09/19, 05/10/19, 08/20/19, 09/09/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins, Florence Hoyt. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)19-51772
01/29/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)20-03971
02/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 10, 2020. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 9, 2020. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-05556
03/24/2020MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time To File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request) Nos 79180/80116. (SC)20-11268
03/24/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and for Respondent to File its Response Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-11339
03/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Apellant's Opening Brief and for Respondent to File its Response Brief. Nos. 79180/80116.(SC).20-11382
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 11, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have until July 10, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant's motion for an extension of time filed on March 24, 2020, is denied as moot. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-13655
05/11/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17739
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. I. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17745
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. II. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17749
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. III. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17751
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. IV. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17753
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. V. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17759
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. VI. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17771
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. VII. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17774
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. VIII. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17779
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. IX. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17785
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. X. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17790
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. XI .Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17791
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. XII. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17799
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOL. XIII. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-17804
06/24/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Third Request) and for Appellants to File its Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 79180/80116 (SC)20-23403
07/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-25424
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. I. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-25428
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. II. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-25430
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. III. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)20-25432
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a joint motion requesting a third extension of time to file the answering brief and a first extension of time to file the reply brief. This court takes no action in regard to the request for extension to file the answering brief, as the answering brief and appendix were timely filed on July 9, 2020. The request for an extension of time to file the reply brief was based on a presumptive later filing date for the answering brief, which would have caused the reply brief to be due in early September, conflicting with "important deadlines of Appellants' counsel." However, the reply brief is now due to be filed, in the ordinary course, on or before August 10, 2020, avoiding this presumed conflict. Accordingly, the request for an extension of time to file the reply brief is denied, without prejudice to refile as the deadline nears, if deemed necessary. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-26183
07/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Reply Brief due: August 24, 2020. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-26880
08/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 8/21/2020) (SC)
08/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.(SC)20-30944
08/21/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-30950
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Vol. XIV. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).20-30951
08/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).
01/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on February 10, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).21-00266
01/27/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-02504
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel RP/LS/AS. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC).
05/24/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Silver J. dissenting. SNP21-RP/LS/AS Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)21-14786
05/27/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: June 25, 2021. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)21-15257
05/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. respondents' petition for rehearing due: June 25, 2021. Nos 79180/80116. (SC)21-15372
06/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice of Settlement. Nos. 79180/80116 (SC)21-16975
06/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement which includes a request for an extension of time to file a stipulation for dismissal. The request is granted. The parties shall have until July 29, 2021, to file the stipulation for dismissal or a petition for rehearing. Nos 79180/80116 (SC)21-17832
07/08/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Settlement. Nos. 79180/80116 (SC)21-19584
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these consolidated appeals are dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Nos. 79180/80116. (SC)21-19706