Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80124
Short Caption:TAUKITOKU (SAMISONI) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):53220, 67578
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080074Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/09/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/03/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-48891
12/12/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)19-50411
12/12/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-50412
03/31/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-12253
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2020. (SC).20-13648
06/01/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-20482
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)20-20483
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)20-20485
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)20-20486
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)20-20487
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)20-20488
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)20-20489
07/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 15, 2020. (SC)20-24541
07/15/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-25954
08/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time Motion for Reply Brief. (SC)20-29993
08/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved, Appellant's Reply Brief due 9/14/2020 (SC)20-30034
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-32968
09/09/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16892
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19186
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 8, 2021. (SC)21-19186