Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80139
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ-QUEZADA (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 18-CR-0006Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-49098
12/26/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-52201
01/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC).20-00414
01/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/12/19, 06/13/19, 06/14/19, 06/17/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/13/20). (SC)
01/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request.20-01577
01/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/12/19, 06/13/19, 06/14/19, 06/17/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. (SC)20-01694
02/28/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christy Joyce stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/12/19, 06/13/19, 06/14/19, 06/17/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. (SC)20-08106
04/02/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-12611
04/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 4, 2020. (SC).20-12695
05/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-16842
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 18, 2020. (SC).20-17534
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-18945
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2 (Part A). (SC)20-18946
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2 (Part B). (SC)20-18947
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2 (Part C). (SC)20-18948
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3 (Part A). (SC)20-18949
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3 (Part B). (SC)20-18950
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3 (Part C). (SC)20-18951
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4 (Part A). (SC)20-18952
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4 (Part B). (SC)20-18953
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4 (Part C). (SC)20-18954
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5 (Part A). (SC)20-18955
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5 (Part B). (SC)20-18956
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5 (Part C). (SC)20-18957
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6 (Part A). (SC)20-18958
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6 (Part B). (SC)20-18959
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6 (Part C). (SC)20-18960
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7. (SC)20-18961
05/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-18962
06/03/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-20901
07/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 20, 2020. (SC)20-24613
07/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-26513
07/21/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11070
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13420
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2021. (SC)21-13420