Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80155
Short Caption:IN RE: GORMLEY IRISH IRREVOCABLE TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80285, 80285-COA, 80286, 80286-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P099082Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-49356
12/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-49358
12/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice to Court Regarding Fees. (SC)19-52161
01/23/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/16/19. (SC)20-03228
01/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Informa Pauperis. (SC)20-03664
02/20/2020OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
03/10/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 01/27/20. Order Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-09397
03/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, pay the filing fee or file a motion that complies with NRAP 24(a)(5)(A). (SC)20-10010
03/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-10676
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC).20-11637
03/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-11782
04/27/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal and Consolidating Appeals. "The appeal in Docket No. 80155 is dismissed." Because the remaining appeals arise from the same underlying litigation and involve the same parties, this court elects to consolidate the appeals for all appellate purposes. Because the record has been ordered in Docket No. 80286, no record will be ordered for Docket No. 80285. Appellant shall have until July 27, 2020, to file a single opening brief. Nos. 80155/80285/80286. NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC)20-15954
05/22/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-19549
05/22/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/12/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2020. (SC)20-19549