Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80160
Short Caption:FAIRWAY CHEVROLET CO. VS. KELLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72444
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A674480Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-49401
12/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC)19-49405
12/05/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
12/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC)19-49414
12/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-49417
12/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from George O West III. Check no. 1184. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
12/06/2019Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:19-49632
12/11/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jolley Urga Woodbury Holthus & Rose. Check no. 00616501. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC)
12/12/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)19-50347
12/18/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/19, 06/05/19, 09/25/19. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. (SC)19-51231
12/26/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. (SC)19-52202
03/12/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:2/19/19, 6/5/19, 9/25/19. (SC)20-09907
03/19/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).20-10733
03/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 6, 2020. (SC).20-10756
05/05/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)20-16998
05/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 5, 2020. (SC).20-19283
06/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (William Urga for Appellant/Cross Respondent). (SC)20-20977
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-21086
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)20-21087
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3 Part 1. (SC)20-21094
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3 Part 2. (SC)20-21099
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4. (SC)20-21102
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-21113
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 6. (SC)20-21114
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 7. (SC)20-21115
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 8. (SC)20-21116
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 9. (SC)20-21117
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 10. (SC)20-21118
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 11. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC)
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 13. (SC)20-21121
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 14. (SC)20-21122
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 18. (SC)20-21123
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 15. (SC)20-21124
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 16. (SC)20-21125
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 17. (SC)20-21126
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 19. (SC)20-21128
06/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 20. (SC)20-21129
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 21. (SC)20-21161
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 22. (SC)20-21166
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 23. (SC)20-21168
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 24. (SC)20-21169
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix- Volume 25. (SC)20-21170
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 26. (SC)20-21173
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 27. (SC)20-21174
06/05/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC)20-21181
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 11. (SC)20-21252
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 12. (SC)20-21253
06/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-21881
06/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal Due: July 7, 2020. (SC)20-21907
06/12/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief (Corrected). (SC)20-21994
06/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: August 4, 2020. (SC).20-24013
07/16/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-26175
08/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until September 3, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC)20-28708
09/03/2020BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Answering Brief. (SC)20-32657
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 1 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC)20-32661
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 2 (REJECTED PER NOTICED ISSUED ON 9/4/2020) (SC)
09/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days.20-32706
09/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Appendix (SC)20-33435
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. I (SC)20-33436
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. II (SC)20-33437
09/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-Appellant's motion to file a corrected appendix is granted. See NRAP 27. The corrected appendix was filed on September 10, 2020. (SC)20-35756
09/30/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-35850
09/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Due date Nov. 4th, 2020 (SC)20-35909
11/03/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Second Request). (SC)20-40098
11/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until December 4, 2020, to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC)20-41127
12/04/2020BriefFiled Fairway Chevrolet Company's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-43989
12/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-45633
12/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until February 3, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC)20-46578
01/30/2021BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)21-02954
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm the district court's order denying Fareway's request for attorney fees, and we reverse the district court's order awarding costs insofar as it awarded costs for Westlaw research and airline travel. On remand, the district court shall enter a new order awarding costs that excludes those two items." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11123
05/04/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/5/21) (SC)
05/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-12823
05/05/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-12884
05/05/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from L. Christopher Rose. (SC)
05/18/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-14237
06/14/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16932
06/14/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2021. (SC)21-16932