Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80170
Short Caption:CAMPBELL (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C316901Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-49718
12/16/2019Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 3945 returned to Weiner Law Group. (SC)
12/31/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-52508
01/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-00895
01/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/9/19, 9/10/19, 9/11/19, 9/12/19, 9/13/19, 9/16/19, 9/17/19, 9/18/19, 9/19/19, 9/20/19, and 11/13/19. To Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran, Gail Reiger, and Trisha Garcia. (SC)20-01019
02/25/2020MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC).20-07553
03/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Lara Corcoran shall have until April 1, 2020, to file a notice with this court that the completed transcripts have been filed and delivered. Given this extension, appellant shall have until May 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-09117
03/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/9/19 and 11/13/19. (SC)20-12145
05/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File And Serve Appellant's Opening Brief & Appendix. (SC)20-18477
06/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 21, 2020. (SC).20-21142
07/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26686
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1. (SC)20-26687
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2. (SC)20-26688
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3. (SC)20-26689
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4. (SC)20-26690
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5. (SC)20-26691
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7. (SC)20-26692
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 8. (SC)20-26693
07/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6. (SC)20-26780
07/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Errata to Table of Authorities. (SC)20-26835
08/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Taleen Pandukht.(SC)20-30635
08/19/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-30636
08/19/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-30637
09/11/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file a Reply Brief (SC)20-33492
09/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-33862
11/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39911
11/03/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-05678
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12367
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15027
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15027