Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80171
Short Caption:GILLEN (MARTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C318999Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-49721
12/12/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/12/19, 0913/19, 09/16/19, 09/17/19, 09/18/19, 09/19/19 and 11/18/19. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson. (SC)19-50360
12/16/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-50834
01/27/2020MotionFiled Court Recorder's Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Transcripts. (SC)20-03697
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Christine Erickson's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 3, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 8, 2020. (SC).20-05942
05/08/2020BriefFiled Brief Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-17585
05/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes I-VI. (SC).20-17586
06/08/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-21329
06/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 8, 2020. (SC)20-21371
07/08/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-25076
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 7, 2020. (SC).20-26126
08/07/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-29090
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-33059
09/08/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13947
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16312
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16312