Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80185
Short Caption:CLARKE (ANTHONY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80130, 80130-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR191352Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/2019Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/10/2019Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC)19-50062
01/03/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." MG/KP/JH. (SC).20-00380
01/16/2020Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Document Regarding Case. (SC)20-02251
01/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action on petitioner's document requesting that this court intervene in the district court's decision to hold petitioner's filings in abeyance pending resolution of this petition. (SC).20-03713
01/28/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-03787
01/28/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)