Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80212
Short Caption:IN RE: JUDICIAL DISCIPLINE OF JENNIFER HENRYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Civil Appeal - Judicial Discipline - Certified Order
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. (SC)
12/13/2019Order/IncomingFiled Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Imposition of Discipline. (SC)19-50560
12/23/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SC)19-51799
01/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts Requested: 2/20/19 and 11/15/19. To Court Reporter for Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline. (SC)20-00885
01/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-01585
01/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jazlein Taylor stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/15/19. (SC).20-02839
04/14/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-14111
04/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Due May 21, 2020. (SC)20-14176
05/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting the Court Direct the Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline to Transmit Original Video Exhibits. (SC)20-18513
05/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC)20-19054
05/21/2020BriefFiled Opening Brief Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC)
05/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-19550
05/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1. (SC)20-19552
05/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2. (SC)20-19553
05/26/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-19774
05/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief Due: July 22, 2020. (SC)20-19908
05/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The Commission shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court Special Prosecutor's Exhibit 1, including two JAVS recordings for the October 10, 2016, hearing. (SC).20-20140
06/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Transmission of JAVS Recordings of Confidential Juvenile Court Proceedings. (SC)20-21830
06/10/2020ExhibitFiled Confidential JAVS recordings of October 10, 2016. (SC)
07/22/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-26767
07/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/29/20). (SC)
07/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Request to Withdraw Respondent's Appendix. (SC)20-26787
07/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Amended Appendix. (SC)20-26788
07/27/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation to Withdraw Respondent's Original Appendix. (SC)20-27292
07/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent's motion and the parties' stipulation to withdraw the original "Respondent's Appendix" are granted and approved. The clerk of this court shall strike the original "Respondent's Appendix" filed on July 22, 2020. Respondent's amended appendix was filed on July 22, 2020. (SC)20-27616
08/10/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-29358
08/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 21, 2020. (SC)20-29480
09/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief (SC)20-34644
09/22/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/23/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the Commission's decision in its entirety." EN BANC (SC)20-46399
01/22/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-02048
01/22/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)