Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80243
Short Caption:SZYMBORSKI VS. SPRING MOUNTAIN TREATMENT CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66398, 80362, 81109
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A700178Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
12/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-51170
12/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)19-51172
12/31/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. (SC).19-52536
01/02/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. (SC)20-00166
01/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/26/19 and 11/05/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-00167
01/06/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Appellant's Motion for a stay of the district court proceedings is denied as moot.] SNP20-MG/LS/AS. (SC).20-00638
01/31/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-04322
01/31/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
02/21/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 5, 2020. (SC)20-04322