Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80277
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Fred C. Page. (SC)
12/30/2019Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Action Necessary by January 6, 2020, Start of School Second Semester) (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 12/31/19)19-52327
12/30/2019AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix for Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Volume 1. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 12/31/19)19-52329
12/30/2019AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix for Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Volume 2. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 12/31/19)19-52330
12/30/2019AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix for Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Volume 3. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 12/31/19)19-52331
12/31/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-52463
12/31/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/02/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's motion for transmittal of a report involving the minor child.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
01/27/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/27/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-03579
01/27/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/22/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Motion to Petition Writ # COA-80277 for Review by the Supreme Court Pursuant to NRAP 40(B)(1)(2)(3)." (SC).20-26828