Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80295
Short Caption:LEONARD (GREGORY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):31151, 39627, 51607
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A796574, C126285Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/26/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/31/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-52520
01/15/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certification Under NRAP 9(A). (SC)20-01965
01/15/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-01967
04/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-16239
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 27, 2020. (SC).20-17481
08/27/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-31667
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 10. (SC)20-31669
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 10. (SC)20-31670
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 10. (SC)20-31671
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 10. (SC)20-31672
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 10. (SC)20-31673
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 10. (SC)20-31674
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 10. (SC)20-31675
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 10. (SC)20-31676
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 10. (SC)20-31677
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 10. (SC)20-31678
09/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Karen Mishler for respondent. (SC)20-35316
09/25/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-35317
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 1. (SC)20-35320
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 2. (SC)20-35321
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39115
10/26/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
12/09/2020MotionFiled Suggestion of Death. (SC)20-44797
12/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's counsel has filed a suggestion of death on the record and a notice of withdrawal of appeal in which counsel informs this court that appellant is deceased. Because counsel generally "cannot act on a deceased client's behalf, this court will address the document only as a suggestion of appellant's death on the record. Appellant's personal representative, if any, shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file a motion for substitution with this court pursuant to NRAP 43(a)(1) if he or she wishes to proceed with this appeal. If no personal representative is substituted within the allotted time, this appeal will be dismissed, and appellant's conviction will stand. The proceedings in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-45361
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC).
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed and appellant's conviction stands." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10108
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12527
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12527