Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80311
Short Caption:KELLEY (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C332278-2Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/02/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal. (SC)
01/02/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and notice of briefing schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-00081
01/03/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/15/19, 08/16/19, 08/19/19, 08/20/19, 08/21/19, 08/22/19, 08/23/19, 08/26/19, 08/27/19, 11/21/19. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (SC).20-00432
01/13/2020MotionFiled Court Recorder Maria L. Garibay's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts. (SC)20-01579
01/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-01692
01/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Maria Garibay's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 20, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2020. (SC).20-02973
04/06/2020MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. (SC).20-12916
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant, Monique McNeill, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Monique McNeill as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall continue to be represented by Jonathan MacArthur. (SC).20-13669
04/23/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria L. Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed. (SC)20-15478
05/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-19857
06/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-20971
06/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 31, 2020. The motion for extension of time filed on June 4, 2020, is denied as moot. (SC).20-21149
08/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-31909
08/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Vols. I-VII. (SC)20-31910
09/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Chief Deputy District Attorney Teleen Pandukht of the Clark County District Attorney's Office appearing as counsel for respondent. (SC)20-35383
09/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 9/25/20). (SC)20-35385
09/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-35388
09/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/13/19 and 08/14/29. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (SC)20-35438
09/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-35508
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 30, 2020. (SC).20-35971
10/29/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/13/19 and 08/14/19. (SC)20-39689
11/30/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43293
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)20-43294
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)20-43297
11/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits Under NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-43300
12/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a motion requesting that this court direct the district court clerk to transmit certain original exhibits. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit State's exhibits 190, 214, and 216 to the clerk of this court. Respondent's motion is denied, without prejudice, in regard to State's exhibit 215. (SC)20-43781
12/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46949
12/30/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP20 - RP/JH/EC (SC)21-11428
05/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14134
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 18, 2021. (SC)21-14134