Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80313
Short Caption:CANNIZZARO VS. DIST. CT. (SETTELMEYER)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19OC001271BClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/11/2020 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:02/11/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/03/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
01/03/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-00247
01/03/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 1 Part A. (SC)20-00315
01/03/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 1 Part E. (SC)20-00316
01/03/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 2 Part D. (SC)20-00318
01/03/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 3 Part C. (SC)20-00322
01/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioners' Notice of Filing and Correction of Filing Dates Relating to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-00329
01/03/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion under NRAP 8(a)(2) and NRAP 27(e) for Stay of All District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Action necessary by January 13, 2020. (SC)20-00333
01/03/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Emergency Motion under NRAP 8(a)(2) and NRAP 27(e) for Stay of All District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-00335
01/06/2020MotionFiled Real Parties in Interests Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)20-00709
01/06/2020MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Senators' Motion to File Opposition in Excess of Page Limitation. (SC)20-00710
01/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Leave to File Emergency Motion and Opposition with Excess Pages. Petitioners' January 3, 2020, motion for leave to file an emergency motion for stay in excess of the NRAP 27 page limit is granted. The emergency stay motion was filed on January 3, 2020. Additionally, real parties in interest's January 6, 2020, motion for leave to file an opposition to the stay motion in excess of the page limit is also granted. The opposition was filed on January 6, 2020. (SC)20-00868
01/08/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8(a)(2) and NRAP 27(e) for Stay of All District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-01029
01/08/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8(a)(2) and NRAP 27(e) For Stay of All District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-01030
01/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer, Granting Stay, and Scheduling Oral Argument. Petitioners have moved for a stay of the district court proceedings pending our resolution of this matter. Having reviewed the petition and supporting documentation, it appears that an answer may assist this court in resolving this matter. Real Parties in Interests' Answer due: 14 days. Petitioners shall then have 7 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We grant the motion and stay the district court proceedings underlying this matter pending further order of this court. Finally, we conclude that oral argument may assist this court in the resolution of this writ petition. Accordingly, oral argument in this matter is scheduled for Tuesday, February 11, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., before the en banc court in Las Vegas. (SC).20-01292
01/24/2020BriefFiled Real Parties in Interest Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC).20-03553
01/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-03647
01/31/2020BriefFiled Petitioners' Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-04508
02/06/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Jurisdictional Issues. (SC) (DETACHED SUPPLEMENT RECORD REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL ISSUES. FILED SEPARATELY PER OPINION FILED 6/26/20)20-05277
02/11/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 80313. (SC).
06/26/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Fn2[Petitioners' February 6, 2020, motion to supplement the record regarding jurisdictional issues is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the supplement from the motion and file it separately.] Fn6[In light of this opinion, we vacate the stay imposed by our January 10, 2020, order.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Silver, J., with whom Pickering, C.J., agrees, dissenting. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 34. EN BANC. (SC)20-23754
06/26/2020MotionFiled Supplemental Exhibit 1 to motion to supplement record regarding jurisdictional issues.20-23773
06/26/2020WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and one copy of the opinion mailed to Attorney Kevin C. Powers for service upon Judge James Todd Russell. (SC)20-23804
07/08/2020WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James Todd Russell on July 7, 2020. (SC)20-25253
07/21/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-26585
07/21/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)