Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80316
Short Caption:FULLER (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77745, 80317
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C286736Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/03/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-00280
01/14/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-01798
01/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/16/13, 1/23/13, 4/2/13, 8/13/13, 9/10/13, 9/12/13, 10/3/13, 1/9/14, 8/28/14, 1/22/15, 2/19/15, 3/3/15, 4/16/15, 9/24/15, 11/3/15, 4/14/16, 10/11/16, 10/13/16, 5/2/17, 5/9/17, 2/1/18, 2/8/18, 5/10/18, 6/21/18, 9/4/18, 10/8/18, 11/15/18, 1/17/19, 2/7/19, 5/28/19, 6/6/19, 6/25/19, 7/23/19, 8/20/19, 9/19/19, 10/10/19, 10/11/19, 10/15/19, 10/16/19, 10/17/19, 10/18/19, 10/21/19, 10/22/19, 10/23/19, 10/24/19, 10/28/19, and 12/17/19. To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols, Brittany Amoroso, Maureen Schorn, Jennifer Church, Loree Murray, Gina Shrader and Robin Page. (SC)20-02137
02/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brittany Amoroso stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/2/13, 8/13/13, 9/10/13, 9/12/13, 10/3/13, 1/9/14, 8/28/14. (SC).20-05012
02/11/2020MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC).20-05679
02/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Robin Page's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: March 13, 2020. (SC).20-06529
02/19/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/1/18, 2/8/18, 5/10/18, 6/21/18, 9/4/18, 10/8/18, 10/15/19, 11/15/18, 1/17/19, 2/7/19, 5/28/19, 6/6/19, 6/25/19, 7/23/19, 8/20/19, 9/19/19, 10/10/19, 10/11/19, 10/28/19, and 12/17/19. (SC)20-06838
02/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/16/13, 1/23/13 (SC).20-07217
03/10/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina M. Shrader stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/14/16, 5/2/17, 5/9/17. (SC)20-09444
03/12/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer D. Church stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/24/15. (SC)20-09886
03/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/16/19, 10/17/19, 10/18/19, 10/21/19, 10/22/19, 10/23/19, and 10/24/19. (SC)20-10278
03/26/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Loree Murray Stating that " This case was not on the court's calendar; therefore, there is no record to be produced." (SC)20-11731
04/09/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Loree Murray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/3/15. (SC)20-13444
04/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File the Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).20-16059
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 6, 2020. (SC).20-17480
06/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File the Opening Brief and Appendix (2nd Request). (SC)20-23785
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 4, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-24743
09/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File the Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-32463
09/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 24, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-33608
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. I (SC)20-34941
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. II (SC)20-34942
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. III (SC)20-34943
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. IV (SC)20-34944
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. V (SC)20-34945
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VI (SC)20-34946
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VII (SC)20-34947
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VIII (SC)20-34948
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. IX (SC)20-34950
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. X (SC)20-34951
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. XI (SC)20-34952
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. XII (SC)20-34953
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. XIII (SC)20-34954
09/24/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (STRICKEN PER 11/6/20 ORDER). (SC)
10/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jonathan VanBoskerck. (SC)20-39008
10/23/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-39009
10/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Amended Opening Brief. (AMENDED OPENING BRIEF DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 11/6/20 ORDER). (SC)20-39021
10/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date: November 25, 2020. (SC)20-39159
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on September 24, 2020. The clerk shall also detach the amended opening brief from the motion filed on October 23, 2020, and file it separately. The answering brief remains due to be filed by November 25, 2020. (SC)20-40705
11/06/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-40713
11/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-42865
12/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46254
12/23/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/01/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Add Document to Appellant's Appendix. (SC)21-03111
02/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a stipulation to add a previously non-transcribed portion of the trial transcript to the record and to amend the appendix to include the additional transcript. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve volume XIV of the appendix containing the additional transcript. (SC)21-03684
02/18/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Amended Appendix. Volume XIV. (SC)21-04809
04/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP20 - RP/JH/EC (SC)21-11429
05/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14135
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 18, 2021. (SC)21-14135