Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80361
Short Caption:CARUSO (JAIDEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80318
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C333318Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-01083
01/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/29/19, 7/30/19, 7/31/19, 8/1/19, 8/5/19, 8/6/19, 8/7/19, 11/25/19, and 12/10/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. (SC)20-01582
01/27/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-03661
04/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-15490
04/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 8, 2020. (SC)20-15567
05/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second). (SC).20-19779
05/26/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/03/19. To Court Reporter: Stacey Ray. (SC).20-19835
06/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 8, 2020. (SC).20-21150
06/12/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/03/19. (SC)20-22061
07/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-24589
07/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. (SC)20-24591
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IV. (SC)20-24673
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume V. (SC)20-24682
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VI. (SC)20-24684
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VIII. (SC)20-24686
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IX. (SC)20-24687
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IX. (SC)20-24690
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. (SC)20-24704
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume X. (SC)20-24720
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume XI. (SC)20-24706
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume III. (SC)20-24711
07/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VII. (SC)20-24719
08/03/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/03/20). (SC)
08/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Karen L. Mishler). (SC)20-28314
08/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Karen L. Mishler). (SC)20-28332
08/03/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-28334
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until September 2, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-29135
09/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-32357
09/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits Under NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-32358
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-32359
09/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion requesting that this court direct the district court clerk to transmit original exhibits is granted. District court's exhibits 147 and 149 due: 14 days. (SC)20-33368
09/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to file Reply Brief. (SC)20-34035
09/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-34040
10/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39509
10/29/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening (SC)
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC).
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13943
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16315
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16315