Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80362
Short Caption:SZYMBORSKI VS. SPRING MOUNTAIN TREATMENT CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66398, 80243, 81109
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A700178Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
01/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-01087
01/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-01091
01/16/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC).20-02182
02/10/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-05448
02/10/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
03/09/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 25, 2020. (SC)20-05448