Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80413
Short Caption:PREMIER ONE HOLDINGS, INC. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A698632Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-02111
01/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-02113
01/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong. Check no. 3494. (SC)
01/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-03619
01/28/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-03866
02/11/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)20-05766
02/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: March 3, 2020. (SC).20-06392
03/03/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-08564
05/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC)20-19895
05/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 26, 2020. (SC)20-19933
06/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC).20-23548
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-24133
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 10, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-24770
08/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-29223
08/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC)20-29448
08/31/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Bank of America, N.A.'s Answering Brief. (SC)20-32036
09/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 8, 2020. (SC)20-32148
10/08/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37038
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Excerpts of Record Pages 001-203. (SC)20-37040
11/09/2020MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Reply Brief. (SC)20-40970
11/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 9, 2020. (SC)20-41079
12/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-44867
12/10/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13970
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16316
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16316