Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80422
Short Caption:BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS. NV EAGLES, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A733777Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/2020 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001677. (SC)
01/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-02220
01/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-02224
01/22/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC)20-02943
01/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Ariel E. Stern, Esq., Darren T. Brenner, Esq. and Scott R. Lachman, Esq. of the law firm of Akerman LLP, file this notice of appearance for appellant Bank of America, N.A. (SC)20-03285
02/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-05252
02/19/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 19, 2020, at 10:30 AM. (SC)20-06874
05/22/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-19643
05/29/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-20363
06/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-21445
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Melanie D. Morgan for Appellant. (SC)20-24123
07/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)20-25149
07/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC)20-25877
09/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-33970
09/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request (SC)20-34033
10/09/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Bank of America, N.A.'s Opening Brief and Appendices. (SC)20-37145
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 12, 2020. (SC)20-38156
11/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Time Extension for Bank of America, N.A.'s Opening Brief and Appendices (First Motion) (SC)20-41368
11/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-42016
12/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-45289
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1, Part 1. (SC)20-45290
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1, Part 2. (SC)20-45291
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 2. (SC)20-45292
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 3. (SC)20-45293
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 4. (SC)20-45294
01/12/2021MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (SC)21-01020
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date February 12, 2021. (SC)21-01035
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Settlement. (SC)21-04255
02/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall have until April 13, 2021, to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss the appeal, or respondent shall file the answering brief within this same time period. (SC)21-04823
04/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Complete Settlement. (SC)21-10749
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The parties have filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the answering brief or a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal based on settlement negotiations. The motion for an extension is denied. The parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal, or respondent shall file the answering brief within this same time period. (SC)21-11683
04/29/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-12346
05/03/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-12623