Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79165-COA
Short Caption:SALVADOR VS. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79165
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A791957Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/16/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
02/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Rex D. Garner of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondents Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.; Bank of America, N.A.; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; Quality Loan Service Corporation; and Bank of New York, F/K/A of New York Mellon). (COA)20-05351
02/10/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Inform the Court That on January 22, 2020 the District Court of Clark County, Nevada Has Finally Issued a Determination to Dismiss the Case to Include the Defendant Meridias Capital. (COA)20-05559
02/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Response to Appellant's Motion to Inform the Court That on January 22, 2020 the District Court of Clark County, Nevada Has Finally Issued a Determination to Dismiss the Case to Include the Defendant Meridias Capital. due: March 3, 2020. (COA).20-06745
02/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant seeks to include defendant below, Meridias Capital, as a respondent; however, no final judgment has been entered by the district court as to Meridias. Meridias is not a proper respondent to this appeal. (COA).20-07901
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondents Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration and Bank of New York Mellon). (COA)20-24280
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing and Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. Respondents shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. . Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of service of the last answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if any. Real Property Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada is invited to participate as amicus curiae in this proceeding and to file a brief addressing the licensing issue. Should the Real Property Law Section elect to participate as amicus curiae, it shall file and serve an amicus brief within 90 days of this order. Appellant and respondents shall each have 20 days from the date the amicus brief is served to file a supplemental brief in response to the amicus brief. fn1[The clerk of the court is directed to modify the caption for this case to conform to the caption on this order.] (COA)20-29178
08/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Of Disassociation (Darren T. Brenner). (COA)20-29271
09/01/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Remand this Case to the District Court. (SC)20-32244
09/04/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. shall have until September 22, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief and a response to appellant's motion to remand this case to the district court. (COA)20-32671
09/22/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (COA)20-34879
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1. (COA)20-34880
09/22/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Response to Appellate Editha Salvador's "Motion to Remand this Case to the District Court, Clark County Nevada." (COA)20-34885
09/22/2020BriefFiled Joinder to Brief Respondent's Brief. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL FROM ATTORNEY) (SC)
09/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Joinder to Respondent's Response to "Motion to Remand." (COA)20-34919
09/22/2020BriefFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Joinder to Respondent's Answering Brief. (COA)20-34921
10/12/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Brief. (COA)20-37347
10/13/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document. "Proper Person Response to Respondents Opposition for Appellant Motion to Remand this Case to the District Court, Clark County, Nevada." (COA)20-37599
10/14/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Answering Brief Dated September 22, 2020 (Reply Brief). (COA)20-37790
10/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Respondents' Opposition for Appellant's Motion to Remand this Case to the District Court, Clark County, Nevada (First Request). (COA)20-38769
11/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny appellant's motion to remand this case to the district court. The Real Property Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada has filed a motion for an extension of time to file an amicus brief. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Amicus brief due: December 31, 2020. fn1 [The clerk of the court shall file the reply that was previously received on October 21, 2020.] (COA)20-42527
11/20/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Response to Respondents' Opposition for Appellant's Motion to Remand this Case to the District Court, Clark County, Nevada. (COA)20-42528
12/29/2020BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of the Real Property Section of the State Bar of Nevada. (COA)20-46821
01/21/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Supplemental Brief in Response to Amicus Curiae Brief Dated December 29, 2020. (SC)21-01838
02/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Donna M. Wittig of the law firm of Akerman LLP, as counsel for respondents). (COA)21-02973
02/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Darren T. Brenner and Rex D. Garner are no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP and requests that Mr. Brenner and Mr. Garner be removed from the service list). (COA)21-03171
06/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-16936
06/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: July 16, 2021. (COA)21-18563
07/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Within Which to File for Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-20147
07/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Within Which to File for Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-20150
07/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 16, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-20439
07/19/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-20745
08/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-24228
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)