Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80439
Short Caption:MANHAS VS. TINKERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A773410Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-02851
01/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-02855
01/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Steven M Burris, LLC. Check no. 15052. (SC)
01/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-03358
01/28/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)20-03818
02/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 11, 2020, at 1:30 PM. (SC)20-05366
02/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-05637
07/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 1, 2020 at 2:30 pm. (SC).20-24609
07/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-25058
07/10/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-25529
07/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)20-26714
10/06/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Appellant to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-36675
10/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 6, 2020. (SC)20-36711
10/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys for Respondent (Thomas E. Winner and Andrew D. Smith of the law firm Winner & Sherrod hereby substitute for and in the place of Ronald M. Pehr, of the Law Office of Lee J. Grant II, as counsel of record for the respondent). (SC)20-37740
11/06/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-40599
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-40636
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC)20-40638
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. (SC)20-40640
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV. (SC)20-40643
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume V. (SC)20-40645
11/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VI. (SC)20-40647
11/24/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Appellant to file an Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-42816
12/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel and Disapproving Stipulation. Attorney Andrew D. Smith has filed a substitution of counsel purporting to substitute himself and Thomas E. Winner as counsel of record for respondent in place of Ronald M. Pehr. The substitution of counsel is disapproved. The substitution is treated as a notice of appearance. The clerk shall add Mr. Smith and Mr. Winner as counsel of record for respondent. The parties have filed a stipulation allowing appellant to file an amended opening brief. The stipulation is disapproved without prejudice. (SC)20-43405
12/03/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Appellant to File an Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-43712
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties' stipulation to file an amended opening brief is treated as a joint motion and granted. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of the amended opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-44343
12/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-44718
01/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys for the Respondent (Thomas E. Winner and Andrew D. Smith of the law firm of Winner & Sherrod, hereby substitute for and in the place of Ronald M. Pehr, of the Law Office of Lee J. Grant II, as counsel of record for respondent). (SC)21-00550
01/08/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-00711
01/11/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 29, 2021. (SC)21-00769
01/29/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend the Answering Brief Deadline (Second Request). (SC)21-02952
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until February 8, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-03329
02/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend the Answering Brief Deadline (Third Request). (SC)21-03807
02/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Extend the Answering Brief Deadline. (Third Request) (SC)21-04053
02/17/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend the Answering Brief Deadline (Fourth Request). (SC)21-04602
02/17/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-04603
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion and an amended motion for a third extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is granted. The answering brief was filed on February 17, 2021. Appellant shall have until March 19, 2021, to file and serve any reply brief. (SC)21-05776
03/17/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Appellant to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-07774
03/18/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 2, 2021. (SC)21-07806
04/02/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-09618
04/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16903
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19187
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19187