Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80443
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) C/W 78744Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78744*, 80443Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 78744, 78744-COA, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788126, C154293Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/22/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/22/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 2/6/2020)20-02929
01/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Consolidate Cases, Waive Appendix Requirement, and Refer to Record in Related Case. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 2/6/2020)20-02930
01/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 2/6/2020)20-02931
02/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)20-05088
02/06/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
04/10/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance and Deny Petition. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and the PETITION DENIED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. Nos. 78744/80443. (SC).
07/07/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 78744/80443. (SC).
07/07/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Petition for Review due: July 27, 2020. Nos. 78744/80443. (SC).20-24995
07/31/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-27921
07/31/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/31/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document- Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Review. Nos. 78744/80443 (SC)20-27939
08/19/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document (Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time or Other Equitable Relief), (SC)20-30577
08/24/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 5, 2020. Nos. 78744/80443. (SC)20-27921