Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80446
Short Caption:WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOC'Y VS. DEAVERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 2019-CV-00057Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/23/2020 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/22/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Aldridge Pite. Check no. 241348. (SC)
01/22/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-02962
01/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-02964
01/23/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC)20-03191
02/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Arthur J. Bayer, Jr. Check no. 213. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
02/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC)20-04611
02/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-05646
02/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC).20-05648
02/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/11/2020). (SC)
02/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC)20-05664
02/12/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Proof of Service - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-05847
02/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-06092
02/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Appellant's Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-06272
02/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing - Docketing Statement served on Arthur Bayer, Esq. and Settlement Judge David Wasick. (SC)20-06289
02/27/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-08027
03/02/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing Appeal and Cross-Appeal from Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge, this appeal and cross-appeal are removed from the settlement program. Appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) and respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) shall each have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondent's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC).20-08237
03/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-08341
06/01/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 15, 2020. (SC).20-20520
06/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-22253
06/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until July 15, 2020, to file and serve the appendix and the opening brief on appeal. (SC)20-22769
07/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually But As Trustee for Hilldale Trust's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/16/20). (SC)
07/15/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-26083
07/15/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC)20-26084
07/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-26143
07/20/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26364
08/12/2020BriefFiled Respondent Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-29838
08/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: September 25, 2020. (SC)20-31809
09/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (SC)20-35196
09/29/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-35742
10/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until October 26, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC)20-36932
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief combined with Answering Brief. (SC)20-39108
11/04/2020BriefFiled Respondent Cross-Appellant's Reply to Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-40195
11/04/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/04/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgments of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12731
06/01/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15519
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15519