Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80447
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/22/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Check no. 1000. (SC) (1/28/20-CHECK RETURNED FOR INSUFFICIENT FUNDS)
01/22/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 1/24/2020.)20-02968
01/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceeds Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Stay. Action Required by 1/27/2020. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 1/24/2020.)20-02970
01/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Seal Appendix Attached to Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition to Disqualify Judge Mathew P. Harter for Bias and Partiality and Petition to Vacate July 16, 2019 No Contact Order with Thomas Standish without Jurisdiction or Evidentiary Hearing. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 1/24/2020.)20-02972
01/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)20-03508
01/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals
01/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued letter to Ali Shahrokhi re: check returned for insufficient funds and requesting payment of filing fee within 10 days. (SC)20-03887
02/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Check no. 1002. (SC)
02/06/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[Petitioner's January 24 and February 3, 2020, motions for leave to file appendices under seal are granted, as the district court record was sealed below. SRCR 7. Therefore, the clerk of this court shall file under seal the appendices provisionally received on January 24 and February 3, 2020.] Court of Appeals - MG/JT/BB (SC)
03/02/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
03/02/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-08276
03/02/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)