Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80461
Short Caption:ARMSTRONG VS. TREASURE ISLAND HOTEL/CASINOCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80461-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A795161Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-03317
01/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-03319
01/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-03321
01/23/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp. (SC)
01/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-03386
01/28/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)20-03839
02/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-05432
02/11/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 13, 2020, at 1:00 PM. (SC)20-05693
06/24/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-23364
06/29/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-23975
07/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-26252
09/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: October 12, 2020. (SC)20-35534
10/11/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-37294
10/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-37295
11/12/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief (Answering). (SC)20-41400
11/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: November 30, 2020. (SC)20-41791
11/30/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-43314
12/29/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 13, 2021. (SC)20-46810
12/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-47030
12/31/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-04510
02/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." (VACATED PER 8/26/21 ORDER). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
06/09/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (SC)
06/14/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time File Their Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS) (SC)
06/14/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS) (SC)
08/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Prior Order, Vacating District Court Order and Remanding. "We vacate our prior Order of Affirmance, vacate the district court's order denying the petition for judicial review, and remand this matter to the district court to remand to the appeals officer to apply the recently enacted legislation." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
09/20/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
09/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-27093
09/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
10/19/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 23, 2021. (SC)21-27093