Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80447-COA
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
01/24/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (COA)20-03516
01/24/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceeds Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Stay. Action Required by 1/27/2020. (COA)20-03519
01/24/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Seal Appendix Attached to Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition to Disqualify Judge Mathew P. Harter for Bias and Partiality and Petition to Vacate July 16, 2019 No Contact Order with Thomas Standish without Jurisdiction or Evidentiary Hearing.(COA)20-03520
02/03/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Order on 1/16/2020 Donald H. Pearson Picking Up the Minor From School Without Considering Child's Best Interest, Without Any Evidence, Without Any Evidentiary Hearing. "Action Required by 2/5/2020." (COA)20-04554
02/03/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Motion to Seal Appendix Attached to Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition to Stay Court Order on 1/16/2020 Donald H. Pearson Picking Up the Minor From School Without Considering Child's Best Interest, Without Considering Any Evidentiary Hearing. (COA)20-04557
02/06/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[Petitioner's January 24 and February 3, 2020, motions for leave to file appendices under seal are granted, as the district court record was sealed below. SRCR 7. Therefore, the clerk of this court shall file under seal the appendices provisionally received on January 24 and February 3, 2020.] Court of Appeals - MG/JT/BB (COA)20-05168
02/06/2020AppendixFiled (SEALED) Proper Person Document. Appendix Volumes 1-5. (COA)
02/06/2020AppendixFiled (SEALED) Proper Person Petitioner's Appendix (AP 1 through 27). (COA)
03/02/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
03/02/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)