Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80493
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. STATE C/W 80492Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80492*, 80493Related Case(s):58101, 61006, 73000, 74070, 74070-COA, 74859, 74859-COA, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A801802, C224572Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/18/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/29/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-03981
02/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Records, and Regarding Briefing. In the interest of judicial economy, these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Record on Appeals due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. Nos. 80492/80493. (SC).20-06555
02/28/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (A801802). Nos. 80492/80493. (SC)20-08098
02/28/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (C224572), Vols. 1 - 75 via FTP. Nos. 80492/80493. (SC)20-08123
03/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 9 to 18 (A-19-801802-W) (SEALED). Nos. 80492/80493. (SC)
03/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 43 to 50, 1750 to 1757, 1759 to 1760, 1787 to 1788, 1830, 1880 to 1882, 2116 to 2121, 2147 to 2149, 2170 to 2172, 2174 to 2179, 2182 to 2184, 2711 to 2715, 2720, 2919 to 2924, 9574 to 9580, 11643 to 11800 and 11801 (06C224572-2) (SEALED). Nos. 80492/80493. (SC)
03/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 9450 to 9460 (06C224572-2) (SEALED). Nos. 80492/80493). (SC)
03/30/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. Nos. 80492/80493. (SC).20-12151
05/18/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. Nos. 80492/80493. (SC).