Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 37531
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/04/2002 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/04/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).01-04222
03/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.01-05258
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel.01-07255
05/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed on March 8, 2001. Due Date: 10 days
05/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Proposed Instructions 12/18/00; 1/9/01; 1/10/01; Pretrial Motions 1/5/01; Trial 1/8/01 - 1/12/01. To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin.01-07847
05/14/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Monday, January 8, 2001, 1:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Jennifer D. Church.01-07964
06/25/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/10/01; 01/11/01; 01/12/01. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell.01-10725
07/02/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 6, 2001.01-11092
07/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.01-12921
08/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, transcripts for proceedings conducted on December 18, 2000, and January 9, 2001, still need to be filed with this court. Ms. Valentin shall have 20 days to prepare and file the above transcripts. If more time is needed, Ms. Valentin shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time. If the transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Valentin shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time. Appellant shall have to and including September 5, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time will be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 30 days of service of the answering brief.01-13120
08/13/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Yvonne M. Valentin re: transcripts requested in this court's 8/2/01 order.01-13738
09/07/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 09/05/01.01-15107
09/07/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.01-15108
10/09/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 29, 2001.01-16893
10/31/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 40 pages.01-18215
10/31/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.01-18217
10/31/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.01-18219
12/07/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/03/01.01-20587
02/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 2, 2001, this court entered an order noting that the transcript for Tuesday, January 9, 2001, had not been filed. We directed Ms. Valentin to file the missing transcript within 20 days. Ms. Valentin responded to our order of August 2, 2001, by letter dated August 9, 2001. Ms. Valentin informs this court that the court reporter present at the proceedings conducted on January 9, 2001, was Jacqueline Chaney. We admonish counsel for appellant for incorrectly designating court reporter Valentin in the transcript request form. We direct the clerk of the district court to certify and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 10 days from the date of this order, the transcript of proceedings conducted on January 9, 2001, in Case No. 99-C-156542-C.02-02389
02/14/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 9, 2001. Court Reporter: Jacquie J. Chaney.02-02954
04/22/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 4, 2002, at 1:00 p.m. in Carson City. (SNP02-CY/DA/ML)
05/20/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/04/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
07/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." - SNP02-CY/DA/ML02-11797
08/06/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur.02-11877
08/06/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002.02-11877