Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80443-COA
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) C/W 78744Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:78744-COA*, 80443-COARelated Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 78744, 78744-COA, 80443, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788126, C154293Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/06/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
02/06/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (COA)20-05089
02/06/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Consolidate Cases, Waive Appendix Requirement, and Refer to Record in Related Case. (COA)20-05090
02/06/2020MotionFiled Filed Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (COA)20-05091
02/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant's motion to consolidate these two matters is granted. NRAP 3(b). Appellant's request to waive the appendix requirement is also granted. This court will refer to the record in Docket No. 78744-COA when resolving the issues raised in Docket No. 80443-COA. This court takes no action on petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed in Docket No. 80443-COA. The filing fee has already been waived. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).20-05290
04/10/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance and Denying Petition. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and the PETITION DENIED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. Nos. 78744/80443.20-13721
04/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: May 12, 2020. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).20-15310
05/18/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).20-18869
05/22/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Errata to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA)20-19673
06/23/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearings. "Rehearings Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).20-23310
07/07/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).
07/07/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. Nos. 78744/80443. (COA).