Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80532
Short Caption:BEDROSIAN (EDWARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C324176Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/06/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-05130
02/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-05431
02/27/2020MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC).20-08026
03/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Robin Page shall have until March 30, 2020, to file a notice with this court that the completed transcripts have been filed and delivered. (SC)20-09121
04/13/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/13/19, 11/14/19, 11/15/19, 11/18/19, 11/19/19, 11/20/19, 11/21/19, 11/22/19. (SC)20-13985
05/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-19428
05/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 5, 2020. (SC).20-20141
09/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-34711
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (SC)20-34712
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 (SC)20-34713
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 (SC)20-34714
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4 (SC)20-34715
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5 (SC)20-34716
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6 (SC)20-34718
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 7 (SC)20-34721
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 8 (SC)20-34722
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 9 (SC)20-34723
10/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jonathan VanBoskerck. (SC)20-38530
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-38531
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 23, 2020. (SC)20-39425
12/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46255
12/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/24/20). (SC)
12/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.20-46542
12/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46593
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19789
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22473
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22473