Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80553
Short Caption:MOORE (QUENTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80497-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR190436AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-05347
02/14/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-06303
03/26/2020MotionFiled Court Reporter Erin Ferretto's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript Request. (SC)20-11740
03/26/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/26/20. (SC)20-11741
03/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Erin Ferretto's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 29, 2020. (SC).20-12251
04/09/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/26/19. (SC)20-13614
04/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/30/19, 10/07/19 and 10/10/19. (SC)20-16399
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/24/19, 10/02/19 and 10/09/19. (SC)20-16970
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Constance S. Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/09/19 and 10/14/19. (SC)20-17010
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/11/19. (SC)20-17012
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/01/19. (SC)20-17013
05/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/07/19. (SC)20-17019
06/05/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-21278
06/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 8, 2020. (SC).20-21295
07/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)20-25142
07/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 7, 2020. (SC).20-26043
07/29/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Amy Jo Trevino stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/27/19. (SC)20-27700
07/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole J. Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/05/19. (SC)20-27848
07/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:09/23/19. (SC20-27853
07/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/26/20. (SC)20-27855
07/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L.Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/08/20. (SC)20-27860
08/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)20-28992
08/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 8, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-29920
08/31/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/18/19, 09/3019 and 10/08/19. (SC)20-31948
09/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-32862
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume One. (SC)20-32863
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Two. (SC)20-32864
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Three. (SC)20-32865
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Four. (SC)20-32866
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Five. (SC)20-32867
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Six. (SC)20-32868
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Seven. (SC)20-32869
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Eight. (SC)20-32870
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Nine. (SC)20-32871
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Ten. (SC)20-32872
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Eleven. (SC)20-32873
09/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix - Volume Twelve. (SC)20-32874
10/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Kevin Naughton, Appellate Deputy as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-36765
10/07/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-36766
10/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-38721
10/22/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-05679
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13150
06/01/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15520
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15520