Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80563
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. FAIR MAPS NEV. PAC (BALLOT ISSUE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19OC002091BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/12/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Benson Law. Check no. 1275. (SC)
02/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)20-05823
02/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-05827
02/18/2020MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions (Attorneys for Respondent Fair Maps Nevada PAC). (SC)20-06674
02/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano. Check no. 110346. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
02/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Cross-Appellant, Fair Maps Nev. PAC) (SC)20-07213
02/25/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and For Sanctions (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/26/20). (SC)
02/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions. (SC)20-07741
02/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions. (SC)20-07809
02/26/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Secretary of State's Joinder in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-07824
02/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-07825
02/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Joinder in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).20-08161
03/03/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions (Fair Maps Nevada PAC). (SC)20-08565
03/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Fair Maps Nevada PAC). (SC)20-10029
03/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/23/19. To Court Reporter: Kathy Jackson (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/26/20) (SC)
03/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Transcript Request Form. (SC)20-11556
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant Fair Maps Nevada PAC has moved to dismiss this appeal and for sanctions. Having considered the arguments of the parties, this court denies the motion to dismiss and for sanctions. (SC).20-11659
03/27/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC).20-11797
03/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC).20-11800
03/27/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC).Y20-11801