Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80570
Short Caption:LOPEZ (ARTHUR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A801960, C317553Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/17/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/12/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-05871
03/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).20-08626
03/06/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A801960 - VOL 1. (SC).20-09060
03/06/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - C317553 RELATED CASE A801960 - VOL 1. (SC).20-09061
03/06/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - C317553 RELATED CASE A801960 - VOL 2. (SC).20-09062
03/12/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Page 2 (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1-42 and 88-92. (SEALED). (SC)
06/30/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-24091
08/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn3[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19792
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22475
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22475