Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80586
Short Caption:SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLC VS. NATIONSTAR MORTG., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A734861Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/14/2020 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-06142
02/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-06145
02/13/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert. (SC)
02/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-06216
02/14/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC)20-06309
03/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-09094
03/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). (SC)20-09184
03/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on the Settlement Judge). (SC).20-09702
03/16/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Per Settlement Judge, still need approximately 1-2 more weeks to obtain further input and evaluate. (SC)20-10252
04/03/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-12826
04/14/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC).20-14091
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's response to file and serve any reply. Briefing is suspended. (SC)20-14319
05/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)20-18753
05/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause due: May 29, 2020. (SC).20-19590
06/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause Until June 4, 2020. (SC)20-21109
06/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)20-21110
06/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve either a file-stamped transcript request from or a certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn[The motion for an extension of time filed on June 4, 2020, is granted. The response was filed on June 4, 2020. ] (SC)20-22090
06/26/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-23732
09/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-33393
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I . (SC)20-33394
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II . (SC)20-33396
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III . (SC)20-33400
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV . (SC)20-33402
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V . (SC)20-33403
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI . (SC)20-33404
09/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII . (SC)20-33405
10/07/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)20-36783
10/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Due date Nov. 12, 2020 to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-36798
11/12/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-41410
11/19/2020BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and Affirmance of the District Court's Judgment. (SC)20-42349
12/14/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (First Request) (SC)20-45280
12/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date January 13, 2021. (SC)20-45326
01/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time File Appellant's Reply Brief. (Second Request) (SC)21-01169
01/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (Second Request)(SC)21-01173
01/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellant shall have until February 12, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)21-01968
02/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay. (SC)21-03560
02/11/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay. (SC)21-04192
02/16/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Stay. (First Request)(SC)21-04558
02/16/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC)21-04560
02/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to appellant's motion for stay is granted. The opposition was filed on February 17, 2021. Appellant shall have until February 24. 2021, to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-04936
02/24/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply In Support of Motion to Stay. (SC)21-05428
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to "stay" this appeal. The motion is granted to the following extent. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Within 45 days of the date of this order, appellant shall file a status report in this court regarding the certiorari proceedings in SFR Investments Pool 1. (SC)21-09583
04/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Status Report. (SC)21-12063
04/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 21 days. (SC)21-12170
06/03/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19801
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22478
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22478