Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0553
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF THE NEVADA RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE RULE 21Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:02/13/2020Public Hearing:04/22/2020 at 2:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2020Administrative CaseFiled Petition In the Matter of the Amendment of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure 21.20-06174
02/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Exhibit A attached. Hearing to be held April 1, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Nevada Supreme Court in Carson City. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on March 20, 2020. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than April 1, 2020.20-07362
03/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Rescheduling Public Hearing. This court filed an order scheduling public hearing in this matter for April 1, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The public hearing is hereby rescheduled for April 22, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to the Nevada Supreme Court in Carson City. Comments may be submitted to the court in hard-copy format or electronically to nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on April 13, 2020.20-08867
03/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert L. Eisenberg, Esq.20-08877
03/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Debbie Leonard of Leonard Law.20-10499
03/18/2020Administrative CaseFiled "In keeping with public health precautions recommended in response to COVID-19 and the emergency declared by Governor Sisolak on March 15, 2020, the Nevada Supreme Court and Court of Appeals are postponing all oral arguments until further notice. This also includes the public hearing scheduled for April 22 in ADKT 435 and ADKT 553."20-10529
04/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order. This matter was set for public hearing on April 22, 2020, but canceled due the COVID-19 pandemic. Due to continuing concerns about the pandemic and in keeping with public health precautions, this matter will be submitted for decision without public hearing after review of the petition and consideration of written comments. Written comments may be submitted to: Elizabeth A. Brown, Clerk of the Supreme Court, and 201 South Carson Street, Carson City, Nevada 89701 by 5:00 p.m., April 22, 2020. (SC).20-12571
05/07/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 21. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.20-17345