Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80644
Short Caption:SCENIC NEVADA, INC. VS. CITY OF RENOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1901499Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/25/2020 / Andrews, JonathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2020Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
02/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-07322
02/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-07326
02/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Severin A. Carlson, Richard G. Campbell, Jr., and Sihomara L. Graves as counsel for Respondent Lamar Advertising Company). (SC).20-07480
02/25/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. (SC)20-07507
02/25/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Mark Wray. Check no. 13144. (SC)
03/16/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-10196
03/16/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. (SC)20-10239
03/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-10288
03/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement). (SC)20-10317
03/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent City of Reno's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).20-11377
03/31/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is scheduled for the following date: July 24, 2020, at 9:00 AM. (SC)20-12339
03/31/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. (SC).20-12381
04/06/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion. (SC)20-12923
04/28/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant opposes the motion. We deny the motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. (SC).20-16020
07/30/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-27841
08/03/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-28109
08/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-30230
10/20/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/20/20) (SC)
10/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)20-38494
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-38567
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 2. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 3. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 4. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 5. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 6. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 7. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 8. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 9. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 10. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/27/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Part 11. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/28/2020) (SC)
10/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days.20-39408
10/28/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1 (SC)20-39481
10/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Opposition to Respondent's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-39497
10/28/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2 (SC)20-39498
10/28/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vol. 3 (SC)20-39499
10/28/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vol. 4 (SC)20-39501
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Certificate of Service. (SC)20-39713
11/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-39923
11/04/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Reply to Scenic Nevada's Opposition to Respondents' Renewed Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-40183
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion to dismiss the appeal on the ground that this court lacks jurisdiction. The motion is denied. (SC)20-43214
12/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent City of Reno's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43691
12/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent Lamar Advertising Company's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43695
01/04/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-00055
01/04/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-10912
05/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-14086
06/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16795
06/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2021. (SC)21-16795