Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80718
Short Caption:QUINTANA (NESTOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C322311Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice HerndonPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/03/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-08463
03/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-08465
03/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw As Attorney of Record. (SC).20-09510
03/11/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-09612
03/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Supplement to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. (SC).20-10225
03/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-11147
03/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Proceed in Form Pauperis and for the Transcript to be Paid at Public Expense. (SC).20-11694
03/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. The clerk shall remove Nicholas M. Wooldridge and Wooldridge Law as counsel of record for appellant. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 37 days. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC).20-12328
04/24/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel for appellant. - C322311. (SC)20-15710
04/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall add the Clark County Public Defender's Office as counsel for appellant. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC)20-16200
05/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/05/17, 04/20/17, 09/07/17, 09/12/17, 12/07/17, 01/09/18, 01/11/18, 02/08/18, 05/24/18, 09/18/18, 12/11/18, 04/23/19, 05/21/19, 05/23/19, 06/27/19, 07/09/19, 11/26/19, 12/03/19, 12/04/19, 12/05/19, 12/06/19, 12/09/19, 12/10/19, 12/11/19, 12/12/19, 01/30/2020 To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols, Jill Jacoby, Kristine Santi. Request for Certified Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-18872
05/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-18873
05/28/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/10/18, 7/31/18. (SC)20-20170
06/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/17/13. (SC)20-21495
06/19/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:12/03/19, 12/04/19, 12/05/19, 12/06/19, 12/09/19, 12/10/19, 12/11/19, 12/12/19 and 1/30/20. (SC)20-22945
07/10/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/20/17, 09/12/17, 12/07/17, 01/09/18, 01/11/18, 02/08/18, 05/24/18, 09/18/18, 12/11/18, 04/23/19, 05/21/19, 05/23/19, 07/09/19 and 11/26/19. (SC)20-25574
08/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance (William Waters). (SC)20-30774
08/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-30775
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Due: September 28, 2020. (SC)20-31365
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. I (SC)20-35511
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II (SC)20-35513
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. III (SC)20-35514
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV (SC)20-35515
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. V (SC)20-35516
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VI (SC)20-35520
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VII (SC)20-35522
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. VIII (SC)20-35525
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. IX (SC)20-35526
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. X (SC)20-35529
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. XI (SC)20-35531
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. XII (SC)20-35532
09/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-35653
10/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-39391
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 28, 2020. (SC).20-40703
12/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46435
12/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-46436
01/14/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-01249
01/14/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date February 22, 2021. (SC)21-01255
02/11/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-04178
02/11/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/17/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
05/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-13892
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13902
06/01/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-15545
06/01/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-17180
06/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-18723
07/13/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Hardesty, C.J., dissenting. fn1[The Honorable Dougals W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC)21-20179
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22982
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 9, 2021. (SC)21-22982