Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80730
Short Caption:SAENZ-VILLALTA (WALDIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76897, 76898, 81725, 81725-COA, 81836, 81836-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C324629
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790771
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/04/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-08702
03/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/6/17, 8/31/17. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER 3/18/20 NOTICE). (SC)
03/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-10585
03/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/06/17, 08/31/17. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison. (SC).20-10617
03/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-11520
05/06/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette Sison stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/06/17, 08/31/17. (SC).20-17121
07/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 16, 2020. (SC)20-24561
07/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-26147
08/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 14, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.20-28728
09/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (STRICKEN PER 10/1/20 ORDER). (SC)
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. I (SC)20-33835
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. II (SC)20-33836
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol III (SC)20-33837
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. IV (SC)20-33839
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. V (SC)20-33838
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. VI (SC)20-33840
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. VII (SC)20-33841
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. VIII (SC)20-33842
09/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report, Sealed Transcript, Court's Trial Exhibit 14, and State's Trial Exhibits 1, 2, 87, 89, and 91 Into the Record. (SC)20-33843
09/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Amended Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/15/2020) (SC)
09/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)20-33937
09/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Permission to File an Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-33952
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to transmit presentence investigation report, sealed transcript, and original exhibits. Appellant has also filed a motion for permission to file an amended opening brief. The motion to direct the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the presentence investigation report in this matter is granted. Due: 14 days. The motion to direct the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the sealed transcript is granted. Sealed Recorder's Partial Transcript of Jury Trial - Day 4 filed July 11, 2019 due: 14 days. The motion to transmit exhibits is denied without prejudice. Appellant's motion for permission to file an amended opening brief is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed on September 14, 2020. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief. Respondent shall have 37 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-36128
10/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-36253
10/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk, Presentence Investigation Report. Sealed transcript. Sealed Recorder's Partial Transcript of Jury Trial - Day 4 filed July 11, 2019.(SEALED) (SC)
11/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jonathan VanBoskerck. (SC)20-40806
11/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-40808
12/08/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 23, 2020. (SC)20-44651
12/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/21/20). (SC)
12/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-45981
12/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46034
12/21/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-11111
05/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-15047
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17683
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2021. (SC)21-17683