Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80749
Short Caption:EMERSON (PRESTON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70606
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A787137, C301596Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-09147
03/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/24/20. To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 5. (SC)20-09961
03/19/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-10774
03/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order and Suspending Briefing. The deadlines for the filing of documents are hereby suspended until further order of this court. District Court Order due: 28 days. (SC).20-11987
04/07/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 6, 2020. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)20-13130
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC).20-13691
07/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation on Appellant's Opening brief. (SC)20-24295
07/01/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) (REJECTED PER 07/15/20 ORDER).
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)20-24297
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)20-24299
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)20-24300
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)20-24302
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)20-24303
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)20-24304
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC)20-24307
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. (SC)20-24308
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. (SC)20-24309
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. (SC)20-24311
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. (SC)20-24312
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. (SC)20-24314
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. (SC)20-24315
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14. (SC)20-24317
07/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15. (SC)20-24319
07/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the page and type-volume limitation. The motion is denied without prejudice. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief filed on July 1, 2020. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief. (SC).20-26010
07/17/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26256
08/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Taleen Pandukht as counsel for Respondent). (SC)20-29885
08/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-29886
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief VOLUME 12 (FILED IN THE WRONG CASE). (SC)
09/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-33305
09/10/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11120
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13424
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13424