Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80751
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO S.C.M.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J250211Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
03/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (SEALED) (SC)
03/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Parental Termination with Counsel. (SC)
03/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Exhibit List TENISHA MITCHELL - J250211-P6 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL FROM 8TH JUDICIAL). (SC)
03/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Exhibits Lists (Notice of Appeal) (SEALED). (SC).
03/24/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: April 6, 2020. (SC)
03/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/15/19, 11/20/19, 12/05/19, 01/06/20, 02/03/20. To Court Reporter: Rachel Chaisson. (SC).
03/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).
05/01/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Transcript Video Services' Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: May 22, 2020. (SC)
05/27/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/15/19, 11/20/19, 01/06/20 and 02/03/20. (SC)
06/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).
06/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 7, 2020. (SC).
08/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)
08/02/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. I. (SC)
08/02/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. II. (SC)
08/02/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. III. (SC)
08/02/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. IV. (SC)
08/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services' Answering Brief Due: September 8, 2020. (SC)
08/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel F. Polsenberg and Abraham G. Smith as counsel for respondent S.C.M.). (SC)
08/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent S.C.M.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)
08/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Polsenberg and Mr. Smith as counsel of record for S.C.M. on this court's docket. S.C.M.'s motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. S.C.M.'s answering brief due: September 23, 2020. Appellant shall have 14 days from service of the last-filed answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)
09/08/2020BriefFiled Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services Answering Brief. (SC)
09/08/2020AppendixFiled Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)
09/23/2020MotionFiled Respondent S.C.M.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent S.C.M.'s Answering Brief due: October 23, 2020. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date S.C.M.'s answering brief is filed to file and serve a reply brief to both answering briefs. (SC).
10/23/2020MotionFiled Respondent S.C.M.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent S.C.M's answering brief due: November 13, 2020. (SC)
11/13/2020MotionFiled Motion to File "Full NRAP 26.1 Disclosure" Under Seal. (SC).
11/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent S. C. M.'s Answering Brief. (SC).
11/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion to file "Full NRAP 26.1 Disclosure" under seal is granted. Respondent S.C.M. shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit the full NRAP 26.1 disclosure for filing. The NRAP 26.1 disclosure should be submitted to this court via mail. Upon receipt of the NRAP 26.1 disclosure, the clerk of this court shall file it under seal. (SC)
11/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent S.C.M.'s Full NRAP 26.1 Disclosure (SEALED). (SC)
12/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Janne Hanrahan, Chief Deputy District Attorney will substitute in the place and stead of Shannon Richardson, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC)
12/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18923
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21640
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21640