Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80761
Short Caption:BARKER VS. BEBOUT CONCRETE CONSTR., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A798264Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/13/2020 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/10/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/10/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-09436
03/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-09438
03/11/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp. (SC)
03/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-09763
03/13/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)20-09944
03/17/2020Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 14586 returned to Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith. (SC)
03/25/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 21, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC)20-11437
03/29/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-11934
04/20/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. The appellant, Mr. Barker, is in hospice status and is not able to participate in the mediation set for 4/21/20. Therefore the Settlement Judge feels this matter cannot proceed to settlement conference. (SC)20-14960
04/27/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-15862
05/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC).20-17437
07/10/2020MotionFiled Sheila Barker's Motion to be Substituted as Appellant Due to the Death of Appellant Under NRAP 43(1). (SC)20-25462
07/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Substituting Personal Representative. The clerk of this court shall substitute Sheila Barker as the personal representative of appellant Lawrence Ray Barker and shall amend the caption in this appeal accordingly. Ms. Barker shall have until July 27, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-25884
07/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-27133
07/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-27134
08/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Answering Brief Due: September 8, 2020. (SC)20-31369
09/08/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-33009
10/04/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-36376
10/05/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-21289
08/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23955
08/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2021. (SC)21-23955